OR HB2893 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Chapter 231, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Chapter 231, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to land surveying.
Title
Relating to land surveying.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Chapter 231, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-31 | President signed. | |
2011-05-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-18 | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 2--Kruse, Thomsen; excused, 3--Johnson, Nelson, Verger. | |
2011-05-17 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-05-12 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-03-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-15 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Freeman, Weidner, Speaker Hanna. | |
2011-03-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 15, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-02 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |