OR HB2892 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to conduct statewide study regarding veteran-owned small businesses no later than July 1, 2018. Requires department to submit report regarding study to interim legislative committees no later than November 1, 2018. Sunsets January 2, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to veteran-owned small businesses; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2892 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2892/Introduced |