OR HB2891 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 664, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 664, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Department of Veterans' Affairs Veteran Services Grant Fund. Authorizes Department of Veterans' Affairs to make grants from fund for purposes that benefit veterans. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department to make grants that benefit veterans. Requires department to adopt rules, including rules that prescribe eligibility requirements for grants. Limits biennial expenditures for making and administering grants from certain lottery moneys received by department. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Department of Veterans' Affairs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 664, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Monroe, Roblan, Thomsen, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Carried over to 06-30 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Boone, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |