OR HB2889 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises method by which State School Fund grants for Juvenile Detention Education Program are calculated.
Title
Relating to the Juvenile Detention Education Program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Komp [D] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Rod Monroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |