OR HB2883 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Bill failed. Ayes, 15; Nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Roblan, Thatcher, Thomsen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits food vendor from using polystyrene container in selling, offering for sale, serving or dispensing prepared food to public. Provides exception if food vendor ensures that polystyrene container is used only on premises of food vendor and that polystyrene containers used on premises of food vendor are delivered to facility for recycling, processing or conversion into new product. Takes effect January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on using polystyrene containers for prepared food; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Motion to Reconsider (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Bill failed. Ayes, 15; Nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Roblan, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2019-06-06SenateTaken from 06-06 Calendar and placed on 06-11 Calendar by unanimous consent.
2019-06-05SenateCarried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-04SenateCarried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-03SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-05-23SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-21SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-04-24SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-23HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Meek.
2019-04-23HousePassed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 28--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Doherty, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Lively, McKeown, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika.
2019-04-22HouseVote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 34; Nays, 26--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Clem, Doherty, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika.
2019-04-22HouseSchouten served notice of possible reconsideration.
2019-04-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 29--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Doherty, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Lively, McKeown, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Schouten, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark.
2019-04-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-17HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-16HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2019-04-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-02-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2883
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2883/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2883/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2883/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2883/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2883/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29018
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=461054
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=461284
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29710
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473817
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=461283

Bill Comments

feedback