OR HB2883 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 293, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 293, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to order State Fish and Wildlife Commission to revoke all licenses, tags and permits issued under wildlife laws held by person convicted of violation of wildlife laws for unlawfully taking wildlife with culpable mental state, if violation occurred while person was acting or offering to act as outfitter and guide. Prohibits person from applying for or obtaining licenses, tags or permits under wildlife laws if person has been subject to such court order. Extends permissible period for suspension of outfitter and guide registration by State Marine Board for certain violations to 60 months. Authorizes board to deny, for any period, registration of outfitter and guide who has previously had registration revoked pursuant to court order for violation of wildlife laws involving unlawfully taking wildlife with culpable mental state. Applies to violations of agency requirements committed on or after effective date of Act.
Title
Relating to outfitters and guides.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] |
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Chapter 293, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lininger, Sollman. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |