OR HB2883 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides credit against income taxes for fees paid by member of Oregon National Guard or military reservist for Internet service provided outside United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tax credit for armed forces personnel overseas Internet service; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-07-06HouseMotion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gallegos, Garrett, Gelser, Gomberg, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Weidner.
2013-06-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-03-27HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2013-03-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2013-03-26HouseWork Session held.
2013-03-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-02-18HouseReferred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2013-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback