OR HB2881 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for Oregon Hunger Response Fund program services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Oregon Hunger Response Fund; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |