OR HB2871 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 209, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 209, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renames Oregon Youth Conservation Corps as Oregon Youth Corps. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine what additional actions are necessary to meet 40-40-20 goals.] Requires commission to report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to higher education on or before September 15, 2020.] Sunsets January 2, 2021.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Renames Oregon Youth Conservation Corps Advisory Committee as Oregon Youth Corps Advisory Board. Alters requirements for receipt of vouchers for completion of Oregon Community Stewardship Corps program.
Title
Relating to higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 209, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Johnson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barreto, Evans, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |