OR HB2850 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 91, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 91, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that insurer may not issue individual long term care insurance policy until insurer receives written designation of full name and residential address of at least one person to whom insurer can send notice of lapse or termination because of failure to pay premium, or receives written waiver of right to designate person to receive notice. Specifies exceptions. Requires individual long term care insurance policy to provide for reinstating coverage after lapse if insurer receives proof that policy owner was cognitively impaired or had loss of functional capacity before grace period for premium payments expires. Provides that notice of insurance policy's lapse is not] effective unless] only if insurer sends written notice to policy owner at least 25] 30 days before date of lapse and includes explanation of reason for lapse. Specifies methods for sending notice and what constitutes proof of notice]. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the effectiveness of notices of lapse for certain insurance policies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Chapter 91, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |