OR HB2846 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Director of Transportation to require each region described in Act to conduct jurisdictional transfer evaluation and present report on evaluations to Joint Committee on Transportation no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Establishes Oregon Highway Jurisdictional Transfer Fund for purpose of paying costs to upgrade and transfer jurisdiction of highways. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transferring jurisdiction of highways; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2846 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2846/Introduced |