OR HB2839 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 396, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 396, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits entities providing health care services, practitioners practicing health care professions and insurers of health care services from, solely on basis that individual who meets eligibility requirements for receipt of organ transplant is disabled, discriminating against individual with respect to practices related to and coverage of organ transplant. Creates exception. Specifies process for judicial review of claim brought under Act and types of relief that court may grant. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to anatomical gifts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 396, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed.Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Evans, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |