OR HB2835 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to award grants for recreational fishing facilities within urban growth boundary. Directs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to establish pilot program to] award grants for recreational fishing facilities within urban growth boundary. Directs department to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2026.] Sunsets January 2, 2027] 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to fishing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |