OR HB2835 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces requirement that Department of Human Services use reasonable efforts with requirement that department use active efforts to prevent or eliminate need for removal of children and wards from homes or to make it possible for children and wards to safely return home regardless of whether children and wards are Indian children subject to Indian Child Welfare Act.
Title
Relating to juvenile dependency proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |