OR HB2825 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Educational and Workforce Development Bridge Loan Program in Department of Veterans' Affairs to conduct outreach and provide forgivable loans to veterans and disabled veterans who are enrolled in approved course of study, approved professional training, approved workforce development program, or approved apprenticeship in connection with institution of higher education, and who are eligible to receive federal educational aid or other financial assistance that is temporarily unavailable. Establishes Oregon Educational and Workforce Development Bridge Loan Program Fund. Authorizes Director of Veterans' Affairs to use moneys in Veterans' Educational Aid Account for purposes of program.
Title
Relating to loans to certain veterans enrolled in higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2825 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2825/Introduced |