OR HB2813 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers of employees who engage in outdoor work activities to take certain actions to mitigate employee's risk of exposure to unhealthy air quality from wildfire smoke. Requires employers of employees who engage in outdoor work activities to take certain actions to mitigate employee's risk of exposure to unhealthy air quality from wildfire smoke. Requires employers to determine concentration levels of particulate matter in air. Creates exemption for employers who require employees to wear certified respirators while performing outdoor work activities, regardless of concentration levels of particulate matter in air.
Title
Relating to protections against exposure to unhealthy air quality from wildfire smoke.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2813 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2813/Introduced |