OR HB2813 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits broadband Internet access service provider from disclosing, selling or permitting access to personal information of customers of provider. Creates exceptions, including exception for giving express consent. Requires broadband Internet access service provider to take reasonable measures to protect personal information of customers of provider. Requires broadband Internet access service provider to provide notice of provisions of Act to potential customers of provider. Makes violation of Act unlawful trade practice. Establishes Task Force on Broadband Security to study uniformity of laws throughout United States with respect to protecting customers of broadband Internet access service providers. Requires task force to submit report, including recommendations for legislation, to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than December 15, 2017. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to privacy; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-27 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |