OR HB2758 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires at least two commissioners of Oregon Liquor Control Commission to have public health background. Requires at least two commissioners of Oregon Liquor Control Commission to have public health background. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public health requirements of the Oregon Liquor Control Commission; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Fahey, Hayden, Holvey, Marsh, Moore-Green, Nathanson, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Wilde, Wright; Excused, 4--Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Levy, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |