OR HB2743 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for Oregon Medical Coordination Center. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for Oregon Medical Coordination Center. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to coordination of patient transfers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |