OR HB2722 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 423, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 423, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits enforcement of condominium irrigation requirements by association of unit owners following finding or declaration of existing or likely drought conditions or adoption of certain rules by association. Prohibits enforcement of irrigation requirements by homeowners association following adoption of certain rules by association. Permits association of unit owners and homeowners association to adopt rules that require reduction or elimination of irrigation or that permit or require replacement of existing turf with xeriscape. Defines terms and reorganizes certain provisions within each statutory series. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to governing documents of housing associations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 423, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 2--Boone, Power. |
2017-03-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |