OR HB2714 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limits on campaign contributions that may be accepted by candidates and political committees. Establishes Task Force on Campaign Finance Reform. Directs task force to study and make recommendations on reforming campaign finance in this state.] Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Requires political committee to identify as caucus, measure, multicandidate, political party, recall or small donor political committee. Prohibits person from controlling more than one of each committee. Authorizes Secretary of State and Attorney General to require return of contribution excess of limits and impose civil penalty up to 150 percent of total amount of contribution. Repeals Ballot Measure 47 (2006), currently held in abeyance, which establishes limits on political campaign contributions and independent expenditures on candidate races and establishes certain campaign finance disclosure requirements. Becomes operative December 3, 2020.
Title
Relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-06 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-06-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Marsh. |
2019-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |