OR HB2701 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Rural System Development Charges Program within Housing and Community Services Department to pay system development charges for rural affordable multifamily housing. Establishes Rural System Development Charges Program within Housing and Community Services Department to pay system development charges for rural affordable multifamily housing. Establishes Rural System Development Charges Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for purposes of program. Sunsets June 30, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to rural system development charges to support affordable multifamily housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] |
Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass, rescind subsequent referral to Housing, and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-19 | House | Subsequent referral to Housing rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass, subsequent referral to Housing be rescinded, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Housing, then Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |