OR HB2693 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 324, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates crime of encouraging sexual assault of an animal. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Enhances penalty for crime of sexual assault of an animal. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Increases length of time person convicted of sexual assault of an animal is prohibited from possessing certain animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual assault of animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15HouseChapter 324, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-06-10HouseGovernor signed.
2015-06-05SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Johnson.
2015-05-28SenateSecond reading.
2015-05-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-05-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-04-30SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2015-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-04-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith.
2015-04-23HouseSecond reading.
2015-04-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-04-14HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback