OR HB2670 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 210, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 210, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows in-state tuition in certain circumstances for individuals who resided in Oregon but relocated due to position in military, government or humanitarian aid organization. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to in-state tuition at post-secondary institutions of education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 210, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |