OR HB2658 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 436, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires manufacturer of prescription drugs to report to Department of Consumer and Business Services specified increase in price of certain prescription drugs at least 60 days before date of increase. Requires manufacturer of prescription drugs to report to Department of Consumer and Business Services planned] specified increase in price of certain prescription drugs at least 60 days before date of increase. Provides exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drug costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseChapter 436, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-06-20HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-13SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Barreto, Findley, Hayden, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Stark; Excused, 1--Sprenger.
2019-06-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 4--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen.
2019-06-05SenateCarried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-04SenateCarried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-03SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-05-22SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-15SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Health Care.
2019-04-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 8--Findley, Hayden, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 3--Barreto, Evans, Marsh.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-15HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2658
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2658/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28982
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=460537
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29648
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472667
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473746

Bill Comments

feedback