OR HB2658 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes pilot program for purpose of increasing number of public school students who are served by school social workers. Sunsets pilot program on June 30, 2021. Authorizes expenditures from High School Graduation and College and Career Readiness Fund for pilot program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to school social workers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |