OR HB2657 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Environmental Quality to approve or disapprove application for permit within 60 days of receipt or according to timeline established by Environmental Quality Commission for permits that require public participation. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to approve or disapprove application for permit within 60 days of receipt or according to timeline established by Environmental Quality Commission for permits that require public participation. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to permits issued by the Department of Environmental Quality; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2657 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2657/Introduced |