OR HB2653 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 823, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon State University Extension Service, in consultation with State Department of Agriculture and beekeeping organizations, to establish best practices for beekeeping within residential areas. Requires State Department of Agriculture to establish standards for locating apiaries in residential zones in Oregon.] Requires extension service to collaborate with League of Oregon Cities and Association of Oregon Counties to disseminate best practices and information about beekeeping in residential areas. Permits local governments to adopt ordinances consistent with best practices for beekeeping in residential areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to location of apiaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 823, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-30SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields.
2015-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2015-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
2015-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-06-23HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2015-04-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-04-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-04-07HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2015-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2653
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2653/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2653/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2653/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2653/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21345
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21427
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23150
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=362473
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363394

Bill Comments

feedback