OR HB2650 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Chapter 608, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Chapter 608, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal records checks; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to criminal records checks; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Chapter 608, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2011. | |
2011-07-06 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-17 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 49; Nays, 8--Boone, Brewer, Cannon, Gelser, Hunt, Nolan, Thatcher, Tomei; Excused, 2--Hoyle, Smith J.; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Read. | |
2011-06-15 | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Boquist, George, Girod, Johnson, Morse, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Monroe. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-13 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) | |
2011-06-09 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Rules by order of the President. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng) | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-06 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-05-05 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-05-04 | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Barker, Nolan, Olson. | |
2011-05-03 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-07 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |