OR HB2649 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Revenue.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates credit against income taxes for amounts paid by veteran as principal or interest on qualified education loans. Creates credit against income taxes for amounts paid by veteran as principal or interest on qualified education loans. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, and before January 1, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax credits for veterans' student loan payments; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Revenue.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback