OR HB2639 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 740, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 740, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines "source of income" for purposes of prohibiting discrimination in selling, renting or leasing real property.
Title
Relating to housing; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 740, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Motion to reconsider carried. Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Ferrioli, Roblan served notice of possible reconsideration. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Bill failed. Ayes, 15; nays, 15--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Roblan, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Krieger, Weidner. |
2013-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |