OR HB2637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospital emergency departments to accept and treat individuals who need medical detoxification, including by providing peer mentoring. Requires health benefit plans to provide coverage for medical detoxification, including peer mentoring, beginning with plans issued, renewed or extended on or after January 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to addiction treatment; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2637 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2637/Introduced |