OR HB2623 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 160, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 160, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits cost-sharing for health benefit plan coverage of insulin prescribed for treatment of diabetes. Limits cost-sharing for health benefit plan coverage of insulin prescribed for treatment of diabetes.
Title
Relating to the cost of insulin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 160, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |