OR HB2618 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 655, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires State Department of Energy to adopt by rule program for providing rebates for purchase, construction or installation of residential and certain nonresidential solar electric systems and paired solar and storage systems. Requires State Department of Energy to adopt by rule program for providing rebates for purchase, construction or installation of residential and certain nonresidential solar electric systems and paired solar and storage systems. Sets forth rebate limits under program. Establishes Rooftop Solar Incentive Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department to issue rebates. Limits total amount of rebates issued annually for nonresidential systems. Requires certain amount of rebates issued annually to be for systems installed for low or moderate income residential customers and low-income service providers. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for deposit in Rooftop Solar Incentive Fund.] Requires department to submit annual report on program to Legislative Assembly. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to solar incentives; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14HouseChapter 655, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
2019-08-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-29SenateThatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Barreto, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 1--Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh.
2019-06-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-06-20HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-14HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2618
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2618/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28533
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30130
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477233
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478003

Bill Comments

feedback