OR HB2618 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 390, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 390, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases certain fees collected by sheriffs. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to calculate increase or decrease in cost of living and, if cost of living has increased, adjust fees in 2021.
Title
Relating to fees collected by sheriffs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 390, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Buehler, Hayden, Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Greenlick. |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |