OR HB2616 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes sale of unpasteurized milk from small-scale farm through delivery service or at farmers' market or other farm-to-consumer sales location if milk is labeled as unpasteurized. Authorizes sale of unpasteurized milk from small-scale farm through delivery service or at farmers' market or other farm-to-consumer sales location if milk is labeled as unpasteurized. Provides that violation of labeling requirements may be subject to civil penalty and maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Establishes certain safety-related requirements regarding sale of unpasteurized milk, or dairy products from unpasteurized milk, for human consumption. Repeals general prohibition on sale of unpasteurized milk from cows.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unpasteurized milk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-13HouseReferred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback