OR HB2613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Business Development Department to prepare and report master plan for county fairground capital construction. Specifies content and procedural requirements for report. Appropriates moneys to department for biennium beginning July 1, 2019, for consultant services related to report. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to county fairground capital construction; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |