OR HB2610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that State Fish and Wildlife Commission may waive requirement that artificial obstruction in waters of this state provide for fish passage if commission determines that artificial obstruction will be repaired or replaced and is less than eight feet tall, or that artificial obstruction is dam that provides hydropower, drinking water or water for irrigation use, artificial obstruction provides fish habitat and providing for fish passage would increase cost of project by more than 10 percent. Provides that State Fish and Wildlife Commission may waive requirement that artificial obstruction in waters of this state provide for fish passage if commission determines that artificial obstruction will be repaired or replaced and is less than eight feet tall, or that artificial obstruction is dam that provides hydropower, drinking water or water for irrigation use, artificial obstruction provides fish habitat and providing for fish passage would increase cost of project by more than 10 percent. Removes requirement that commission periodically review exemptions from fish passage requirement. Removes commission authority to revoke or amend exemption upon finding that relevant requirements for exemption no longer apply.
Title
Relating to fish passage.
Sponsors
Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Water. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2610 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2610/Introduced |