OR HB2601 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 198, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits guardian's authority to limit protected person's preferred associations with third parties. Permits interested person to move court to review guardian's power to limit protected person's associations and requires court to conduct hearing. Permits court to remove guardian for unreasonably limiting protected person's associations or failing to perform certain duties. Requires guardian to utilize substituted judgment standard for making decisions on behalf of protected person. Permits guardian to utilize best interest standard if guardian is unable to determine protected person's preferences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to guardianships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseChapter 198, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-05-30HouseGovernor signed.
2019-05-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-21SenateCarried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-20SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-05-14SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-04-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barreto, Evans, Marsh.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-05HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Judiciary by order of Speaker.
2019-03-14HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary.
2019-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2601
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2601/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2601/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2601/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2601/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28150
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28754
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=460536
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29445
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=468587

Bill Comments

feedback