OR HB2595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 52, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 52, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alters period during which former member of Legislative Assembly is prohibited from being paid lobbyist from sine die of next regular session that begins after person ceases to be member to one year after person ceases to be member.
Title
Relating to lobbying by former members of the Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 52, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Witt; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |