OR HB2592 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires producers to form or join extended producer responsibility programs for packaging, food serviceware and printing and writing paper. Requires producers to form or join extended producer responsibility programs for packaging, food serviceware and printing and writing paper. Establishes Extended Producer Responsibility Fund. Prohibits sale of products that make deceptive or misleading claims about recyclability. Requires commingled recycling processing facility to obtain disposal site permit. Imposes penalty not to exceed $100 per day for violation of program provisions by retailer and penalty not to exceed $25,000 per day for violation by producer or extended producer responsibility organization. Requires extended producer responsibility organization to first implement program no later than July 1, 2025. Provides that labeling and facility permitting provisions become operative July 1, 2025. Applies to covered products sold on or after July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to extended producer responsibility programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback