OR HB2591 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 619, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 619, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide planning grants to 10 school districts or education service districts to evaluate need and develop plans for school-based health services. Allows mobile school-based health centers to qualify for safety net grants from Oregon Health Authority.] Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide planning grants to 10 school districts or education service districts to evaluate need and develop plans for school-based health services. Requires authority to provide funding to operate school-based health center or school nurse model at conclusion of two-year planning process. Requires authority to develop requirements for up to three school districts or education service districts to receive grants for planning for and operation of mobile school-linked health centers. Requires authority to award grants to three school-based health centers to operate pilot projects to expand student access to mental and physical health care services through use of telehealth. Specifies requirements. Extends sunset on current program for school planning grants and technical assistance from January 2, 2026, to January 2, 2028. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to school-based health center grants; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 619, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman, Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Breese-Iverson, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Clem. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |