OR HB2589 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 71, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 71, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that sexual orientation is not considered physical or mental impairment and that individual does not have disability solely by reason of individual's sexual orientation. Clarifies that sexual orientation and transgender status are] is not considered physical or mental impairments] impairment and that individual does not have disability solely by reason of individual's sexual orientation. Removes provision that employer may not be found to have engaged in unlawful employment practice solely because employer fails to provide reasonable accommodation to individual for disability arising out of individual's transgender status. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to discrimination on the basis of disability; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 71, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |