OR HB2579 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 79, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 79, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority to provide reentry support and services, for specified period of time, to person who completes Department of Corrections incarceration sentence while in physical custody of authority. Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority to provide reentry support and services, for specified period of time, to person who completes Department of Corrections incarceration sentence while in physical custody of authority.
Title
Relating to supervision of young offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 79, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Sprenger. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |