OR HB2570 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Chapter 113, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to tax liens; and prescribing an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax liens; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Chapter 113, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
2011-05-19 Governor signed.
2011-05-16 President signed.
2011-05-13 Co-Speakers signed.
2011-05-10 Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2011-05-09 Second reading.
2011-05-09 Recommendation: Do pass.
2011-05-02 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2011-03-07 Referred to Finance and Revenue.
2011-03-01 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2011-02-28 Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Frederick.
2011-02-23 Second reading.
2011-02-21 Recommendation: Do pass.
2011-02-16 Work Session held.
2011-02-08 Public Hearing held.
2011-01-21 Referred to Revenue.
2011-01-11 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback