OR HB2548 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Legislative Policy and Research Office to study issues related to funding construction of wildlife corridor road crossings and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Legislative Policy and Research Office to study issues related to funding construction of wildlife corridor road crossings and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Specifies necessary contents of report. Sunsets January 2, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to funding for wildlife corridor road crossings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback