OR HB2508 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prescribes requirements for reimbursement by Oregon Health Authority and coordinated care organizations of health services delivered using telemedicine. Requires Oregon Health Authority to ensure] Prescribes requirements for reimbursement by Oregon Health Authority and coordinated care organizations of health services delivered using telemedicine. Modifies requirements for health benefit plan coverage of telemedicine. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than March 1, 2023, on impact of required reimbursement of telemedicine health services by health benefit plans on cost of health insurance premiums in Oregon. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telemedicine; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Health Care.
2021-04-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 3--Cate, Evans, Levy.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback