OR HB2508 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows owner of land to receive liquidated damages in amount not to exceed $1,000 in action in which owner establishes that owner closed land to specific activities and defendant entered upon land and engaged in prohibited activities without permission of owner.
Title
Relating to use of land.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2508 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2508/Introduced |