OR HB2506 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Organ Donor Registry and Public Awareness Fund. Establishes Organ Donor Registry and Public Awareness Fund. Directs Department of Transportation to accept donations to fund. Becomes operative January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to the Organ Donor Registry and Public Awareness Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Transportation by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Transportation by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-08 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Transportation, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |