OR HB2501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chapter 517, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chapter 517, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that annual report by State Forester to Emergency Board include private property loss information for fires of 1,000 acres or more.
Title
Relating to State Forester reporting of private property losses from fire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | Chapter 517, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Thomsen. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Gorsek. |
2015-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |